Linked charities MIDDLEWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Charity number: 216445
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 22 JUNE 1880 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 18 DECEMBER 1956 AND 12 OCTOBER 1962
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND SICK.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MIDDLEWICH
Registration history
- 01 November 1963 : Standard registration
- 21 May 2007 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.