THE HIND SISTERS HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 30 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND HALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jane Elisabeth Mary Westby | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Gough | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Grantham | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY CLEAR | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN J BURROWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.25k | £42.98k | £25.81k | £32.17k | £30.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.71k | £50.96k | £49.81k | £59.37k | £57.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
HIGH COURT SCHEME OF THE 5 DECEMBER 1924 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE 10 OCTOBER 1947 AND ORDER OF 31 AUGUST 1964
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES TO BE OCCUPIED BY GENTLEWOMEN IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES, OF AGE OF 60 YEARS OR MORE WHO ARE OF GOOD CHARACTER AND MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. REST OF INCOME FOR ALL OUTGOINGS AND FOR PAYMENT TO ALMSPEOPLE OF NOT MORE THAN 15/-WEEKLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Chaucer Drive
Galley Common
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV10 9SD
- Phone:
- 07514678506
- Email:
- JFRISWELL@CAMOZZI.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window