THE BRITISH COMMONWEALTH RIFLE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Club are to promote interest and skill in rifle shooting within the Commonwealth, including by assisting teams and individuals from the Commonwealth competing at prize meetings of the National Rifle Association and the National Small-bore Rifle Association, the better to enable them to take part when required in the defence of their Countries and the Commonwealth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 October 1963: Standard registration
- BCRC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Warburton | Chair | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Seth Dowley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bunch | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jill Cannings | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bromley | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Norman Stuart Penrose | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Steward | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Belither | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.03k | £40.85k | £40.85k | £53.67k | £55.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.80k | £32.85k | £54.08k | £51.17k | £54.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 1963 AND 22 JULY 2010. as amended on 22 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE INTEREST AND SKILL IN RIFLE SHOOTING WITHIN THE COMMONWEALTH, INCLUDING BY ASSISTING TEAMS AND INDIVIDUALS FROM THE COMMONWEALTH COMPETING AT PRIZE MEETINGS OF THE NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION AND THE NATIONAL SMALL BORE RIFLE ASSOCIATION, THE BETTER TO ENABLE THEM TO TAKE PART, WHEN REQUIRED, IN THE DEFENCE OF THEIR COUNTRIES AND THE COMMONWEALTH.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Commonwealth Rifle Club
Bisley Camp
Brookwood
WOKING
GU24 0NY
- Phone:
- 01206 210225
- Email:
- bcrcmemsec@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window