HOLY TRINITY CHARITIES

Charity number: 216512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. The maintenance of a memorial 2. Support for work with children and young people 3. Support for the expenses of the clergy 4. Support for choristers all within the Parish of Startford-upon-Avon

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £981
Total expenditure: £1,848

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 1963: Standard registration
  • 10 October 1991: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael James Anthony Warrillow Trustee 12 May 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
Eve Gillian Archer Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Andrew John Boyes-Varley Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Timothy Charles Raistrick Trustee 01 September 2020
THE STRATFORD UPON AVON CHAMBER MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF SHAKESPEARE'S CHURCH
Received: On time
STRATFORD-ON-AVON MUSIC FESTIVAL
Received: On time
MUNICIPAL CHARITIES OF STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
DENNE GILKES MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
THE STRATFORD-UPON-AVON CHAMBER CHOIR
Received: On time
Rev Patrick James Taylor Trustee 02 January 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF SHAKESPEARE'S CHURCH
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST HELEN'S CHURCH
Received: On time
CLIFFORD CHAMBERS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JACKSONS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £478 £436 £566 £633 £981
Total expenditure £200 £4.35k £1.38k £1.59k £1.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
UNREPORTED VOLUME 71 AT P. 72.
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR. FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO 214958 SEE SCHEME OF 11/02/1986.
Area of benefit
OLD STRATFORD.
Registration history
  • 11 November 1963 : Standard registration
  • 10 October 1991 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
PARISH OFFICE
OLD TOWN
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 6BG
Phone:
01789204923
Website:

No information available