JOHN BUTLER OTHERWISE THE CAUSEWAYS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity is exclusively for the aid of groups, clubs and organisations within the parish of Swineshead, Boston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 30 January 1964: Standard registration
- JOHN BUTLER CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES NORTHGRAVE BOOTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
MICHAEL BROOKES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
KEITH LAWRENCE FOSTER OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ANDREW DUNCAN LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ALAN EDWARD DRING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.14k | £2.20k | £2.24k | £2.36k | £1.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.27k | £6.63k | £1.47k | £1.62k | £2.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF C.C. DATED 19/8/1910 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 18/11/1952 AND 11/8/2003. REP. VOL. 32 P.4 P.49.
Charitable objects
THE YEARLY INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR ANY PUBLIC PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF SWINESHEAD BEING PURPOSES NOT PROVIDED FOR OUT OF RATES, TAXES OR PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
SWINESHEAD LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Hillcrest Gardens
Swineshead
BOSTON
PE20 3UE
- Phone:
- 07976583199
- Email:
- ngconsultancy@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window