THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF BLACKSMITHS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR TRAINEE BLACKSMITHS AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO APPROVED CHARITIES AT THE DIRECTION OF THE TRUSTEE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 January 1964: Standard registration
- THE BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN EDWARD SLATER | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Davis OBE QVRM | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hill Abraham | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Tunks | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alderman Alastair John Naisbitt KING , Warden | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.25k | £62.36k | £96.72k | £48.00k | £120.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.47k | £49.87k | £60.34k | £64.56k | £69.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 4TH APRIL 1957
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OR ANY PART THEREOF TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE COMPANY SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 LITTLE TRINITY LANE
LONDON
EC4V 2AD
- Phone:
- 02072481861
- Website:
-
blacksmithscompany.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window