SOCIETY FOR MEDIEVAL ARCHAEOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education, research, publicaton of research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Susan Oosthuizen | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Fenwick | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Gorden Noble | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Julian Richards | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.53k | £49.84k | £43.66k | £54.29k | £51.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.59k | £37.92k | £23.02k | £58.25k | £38.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/12/1962 AS AMENDED ON 07/12/1970 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/1976 AS AMENDED ON 01/12/1980 AS AMENDED ON 07/12/1981 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/1982 AS AMENDED ON 07/12/1987 AS AMENDED ON 14/12/1991 AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 2012
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY’S OBJECT IS TO FURTHER THE STUDY OF UNWRITTEN EVIDENCE FOR THE 5TH TO 16TH CENTURIES AD, PRIMARILY IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
154 Kenilworth Avenue
HULL
HU5 4BJ
- Phone:
- 01482465543
- Email:
- h.fenwick@hull.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window