INTERNATIONAL BIBLE STUDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide serviced facilities to support religious activity of Jehovah's Witnesses. Arrange for venues to host conventions for Bible education. Pay expenses for and take care of living arrangements for members of the Worldwide Order of Special Full-Time Servants of Jehovah's Witnesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£40,413,966
Donations and legacies | £37.35m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £94.03k | |
Other | £2.97m |
Total expenditure:
£43,841,316
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £43.84m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £43.84m |
People

5 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 November 1964: Standard registration
- 16 September 2022: Funds received from 1056886 ASSEMBLY HALL TRUST, JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (BRISTOL ...
- 15 February 2023: Funds received from 515737 THE DUDLEY ASSEMBLY HALL OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
- 06 December 2023: Funds received from 1039414 MANCHESTER ASSEMBLY HALL OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Simpson | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Sutton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHARLES HALE SYMONDS | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Manley | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karl William Snaith | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.50m | £69.24m | £71.81m | £63.47m | £40.41m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.18m | £72.51m | £75.50m | £48.78m | £43.84m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £27.42m | £29.97m | £34.87m | £59.29m | £37.35m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.26k | £14.05k | £1.58k | £6.71k | £94.03k | |
|
Income - Other | £68.96k | £39.25m | £36.94m | £4.18m | £2.97m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.49m | £4.59m | £3.07m | £7.63m | £7.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.18m | £72.51m | £75.50m | £48.78m | £43.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.61k | £19.47k | £20.40k | £22.44k | £62.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £370.66k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £191.05m | £168.02m | £156.03m | £170.05m | £165.91m | |
|
Long-term investments | £460.22k | £460.22k | £460.22k | £460.22k | £460.22k | |
|
Other assets | £3.74m | £3.79m | £3.11m | £4.05m | £5.16m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £34.04m | £14.33m | £5.35m | £5.63m | £6.02m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/06/1914 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/01/1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 APR 2016 as amended on 21 May 2024
Charitable objects
The Charity’s objects (“the Objects”) are to advance the Christian religion as practised by the body of Christian persons known as Jehovah’s Witnesses, in particular but not exclusively by: (1) Facilitating the provision of Bible-based literature and materials for religious instruction, teaching, education, and worship to Jehovah’s Witnesses and the public; (2) Maintaining one or more religious orders or communities of Jehovah’s Witnesses; (3) Distributing funds and goods to other entities that have similar aims; (4) Engaging in acts of charity, mercy, and humanitarian aid; and (5) Administering the property, facilities, and financial affairs of or pertaining to religious worship of Jehovah’s Witnesses.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Kingdom Way
West Hanningfield
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8FW
- Phone:
- 02089062211
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window