Financial history LLANSILIN MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 216682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.34k £14.03k £8.59k £12.75k £9.90k
Total expenditure £28.26k £7.71k £12.06k £15.53k £12.57k
Income from government contracts £17.44k £4.60k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £600 N/A N/A N/A