Trustees LLANSILIN MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 216682

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMYR OWAIN EVANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PRUDENCE RUSHTON | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE EDWARDS | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
RHIAN MARILYN DAVIES | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVIES | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
HUW EDWARDS | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
LORA SOCKETT | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENNIS SOCKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RHIANNON LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTHUR EDWIN JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUW THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT HENRY EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HYWEL ARTHUR JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH ELUNED JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALED DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORONWY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT OWEN ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WYN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIM ASHFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AWEL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH BICKERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RHIAN MARGARET WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.