RANDALL'S CHARITY

Charity number: 216731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Prevention or relief of Poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,484
Total expenditure: £5,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN MALLALIEU STANLEY Chair
CHARITY OF CHARLES SOAMES
Received: On time
THE GREENWICH CHARITY
Received: On time
Philippa Mary O'Byrne Trustee 21 May 2024
FRIENDS OF WESTCOMBE WOODLANDS
Received: On time
THE GREENWICH CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF CHARLES SOAMES
Received: On time
Rita Lowe Trustee 08 November 2022
THE GREENWICH CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF CHARLES SOAMES
Received: On time
Christine Corrigan Trustee 26 January 2022
CHARITY OF CHARLES SOAMES
Received: On time
THE GREENWICH CHARITY
Received: On time
John Robert Livingstone Trustee 27 September 2018
CHARITY OF CHARLES SOAMES
Received: On time
THE GREENWICH CHARITY
Received: On time
Daisy Claire Smith Trustee 15 February 2017
CHARITY OF CHARLES SOAMES
Received: On time
THE GREENWICH CHARITY
Received: On time
HELEN EMMA NEILLY Trustee 29 January 2015
THE GREENWICH CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF CHARLES SOAMES
Received: On time
PATRIC JOHN RANDLE SANKEY-BARKER Trustee 17 September 2013
CHARITY OF CHARLES SOAMES
Received: On time
JOHN ROBERT MILES Trustee
CHARITY OF CHARLES SOAMES
Received: On time
THE GREENWICH CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.23k £5.18k £5.24k £5.34k £5.48k
Total expenditure £5.50k £5.50k £5.50k £5.50k £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/o St Alfege Church
Greenwich Church Street
LONDON
SE10 9BJ
Phone:
02088586971