THE ASH HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Accommodation for housing elderly people, almshouses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 18 January 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Charles Johnson | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Henry James Hope | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Jacqueline Harris | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Catherine Barbara Ryan | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN ALEXANDER | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|||||||||
GEOFFREY THOMPSON | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|||||||||
PATRICIA LOCKETT | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Rev NIGEL IRONS | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.44k | £9.06k | £53.88k | £52.21k | £48.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £4.30k | £19.13k | £23.00k | £42.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18 JAN 1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR NEEDY PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
ANY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PARISH ALL OR PART OF WHICH FALLS WITHIN A 5 MILE RADIUS OF THE MARKET SQUARE, LEEK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Cosby Drive
East Leake
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 6AD
- Phone:
- 01538373306
- Email:
- john.alexander@voisd.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window