Trustees ABBEYFIELD SOUTH DOWNS LIMITED
Charity number: 216779

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nolan Taylor | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Arthur Thomas | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR IRINA CONLAN | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Anderson | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Timbs | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BYRNE | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM PARIS | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Kathleen Sorenson | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.