LEAMINGTON RELIEF IN SICKNESS FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping people who are sick or in need and who reside in the area of Leamington Spa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 June 1963: Standard registration
- 25 October 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 October 2024: Funds transferred to 235967 THE SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE WELFARE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09k | £2.08k | £2.10k | £2.11k | £3.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.78k | £2.21k | £3.86k | £2.07k | £3.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14 APRIL 1988.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR EXPECTANT MOTHERS BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window