RACHEL CARR'S CHORISTERS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and encourage the musical education of the boys and girls of the Leeds Parish Church Choirs by providing grants to deserving choristers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sam Corley | Chair | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Hawkin | Trustee | 03 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £318 | £328 | £340 | £351 | £353 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS MADE 4/11/1924
Charitable objects
1. APPRENTICING CHORISTERS OF LEEDS PARISH CHURCH TO A TRADE. 2. ASSISTING SUCH CHORISTERS PREPARING FOR ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE BY OUTFITS PAYMENT OF FEES FOR INSTRUCTIONS OR TRAVELLING EXPENSES OR OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE.
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 Ilkley Road
Manor Park
Burley in Wharfedale
ILKLEY
LS29 7HH
- Phone:
- 01133436991
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window