WARWICK UNITED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of Almshouses within the town of Warwick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 September 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Christine HONNORATY | Chair |
|
||||||
Daniel Philip Browne | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Cllr Paul Wightman | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Marilyn Joy Bolton | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Millicent Lettis | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ATKINSON, JOHN | Trustee | 09 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Graham Guthrie SUTHERLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Edward Alan KIBBLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.03k | £74.15k | £173.40k | £68.52k | £110.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.06k | £59.75k | £77.20k | £77.36k | £49.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9 SEPTEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ALMSHOUSES FOR (A) ONE POOR PERSON RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. NICHOLAS, WARWICK FOR NOT LESS THAN 3 YEARS. (B) POOR, AGED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF WARWICK FOR NOT LESS THAN 2 YEARS. SUBJECT THERETO THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME FOR RELIEF IN NEED OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF WARWICK. (SEE SCHEME FOR FURTHER DATAILS)
Area of benefit
TOWN OF WARWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 HIGH STREET
WARWICK
CV34 4AP
CV34 4BE
- Phone:
- 01926491181
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window