WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 216844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide financial relief for needy Freemasons of the Province of Warwickshire and to members of their faimilies as defined in the Trust Deed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £132,045
Total expenditure: £114,212

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • W M B F (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bernard Colin Foad Trustee 08 June 2024
WARWICKSHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
David John Shakeshaft Trustee 10 June 2023
WARWICKSHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Peter Hugh Clarke Trustee 30 November 2022
READING COURT CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Stephen Ernest William Tranter Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
DAVID ANTHONY BUTCHER Trustee 30 October 2020
WARWICKSHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Nigel James Hawkins Trustee 30 October 2020
THE WILLIAM HENRY, 2nd LORD LEIGH MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Howard Leslie Smith Trustee 04 July 2019
WARWICKSHIRE MARK BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Roderick Albert Hinton Trustee 04 July 2019
None on record
Geoffrey Walker Trustee 19 May 2018
SANDWELL VALLEY SCHOOL
Received: On time
WARWICKSHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
THE SANDWELL COMMUNITY CARING TRUST
Received: On time
Stuart Nigel Esworthy Trustee 13 October 2016
LAWRENCE SHERIFF SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
David Ronald Graham Trustee 13 October 2016
None on record
Roy Leslie Frederick Kitchen Trustee 13 October 2016
None on record
Christoper John Grove MBE Trustee 13 October 2016
None on record
LESLIE JAMES TWYNHOLM Trustee 15 October 2015
COMPASS ROSE LODGE NO 9420 BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Philip Hall Trustee 14 September 2014
None on record
John David Harris Trustee 14 September 2014
WARWICKSHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
MERVYN JOHN KIMBERLEY Trustee 24 May 2011
None on record
MICHAEL ANDRE KENNEDY Trustee
None on record
ROBERT HINKS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £122.30k £100.31k £422.68k £125.44k £132.04k
Total expenditure £86.48k £218.01k £130.78k £100.91k £114.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 November 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 November 2020 30 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES AND REGULATION OF 30 OCTOBER1953
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR PERIODICAL PAYMENTS, OR OTHER DISBURSEMENTS, TO APPLICANTS ASSOCIATED WITH THE PROVINCE OF WARWICKSHIRE NOT ELIGIBLE TO PETITION UNDER THE RULES AND REGULATIONS OF THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC FUND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 10 June 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Yenton Assembly Rooms
73-75 Gravelly Hill North
Erdington
BIRMINGHAM
B23 6BJ
Phone:
01214540554