TURNER'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 216962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To maintain eight Almshouses for elderly people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ELIZABETH TURNER CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bernard James Thorpe Chair 01 December 2020
The Sutton Turner Houses
Received: On time
ANNIE SUTTON AND HOULT MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
Julie Ann Carter Trustee 15 December 2022
The Sutton Turner Houses
Received: On time
ANNIE SUTTON AND HOULT MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
Anne Smith Trustee 16 December 2021
The Sutton Turner Houses
Received: On time
ANNIE SUTTON AND HOULT MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
Dale Leslie Spademan Trustee 29 July 2021
None on record
David Poynton Trustee 05 October 2017
The Sutton Turner Houses
Received: On time
ANNIE SUTTON AND HOULT MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
IAN BECK Trustee 31 January 2016
ANNIE SUTTON AND HOULT MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NELSONS SOLICITORS
PENNINE HOUSE
8 STANFORD STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 7BQ
Phone:
01159895251
Website:

No information available