HENRY CHAPMAN FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains contact with pensioners and other ex employees of Brown Shipley Group Companies. Provides financial assistance by making grants where appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Patrick Saunt | Trustee | 11 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER ROBERT SHAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHANIE DOROTHY AVISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.50k | £6.26k | £7.09k | £6.13k | £5.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.03k | £16.35k | £16.98k | £16.53k | £16.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 JUNE 1959
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE. (SO FAR AS IS LEGALLY PERMISSABLE THE FUND IS USED TO HELP OLD AND RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF MESSRS BROWN, SHIPLEY AND CO. LTD., WHO MAY BE IN NEED AND TO AID YOUNGER EMPLOYEES TO BUY BOOKS AND OTHER NECESSARIES IN CONNECTION WITH THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 KINGS KEEP
MAYS HILL ROAD
BROMLEY
BR2 0HR
- Phone:
- 02084608388
- Email:
- timsaunt@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window