PLATTS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local village charity, established for the benefit of the inhabitants of Cossington. The Charity provides and runs a local recreation ground, helps supports works which maintain the appearance of the village and supports local activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 29 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Budding | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Debra Marshall | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Plant | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Unitt | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth James McCague | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sarah Jenkin | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Mary Weston-Webb | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.37k | £9.74k | £17.08k | £10.70k | £16.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.32k | £14.45k | £6.68k | £14.31k | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2021 | 313 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23 OCTOBER 1925. RESOLUTION UNDER SECTION 75A OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED BY THE CHARITIES ACT 2006 DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
FOR ANY PUBLIC OR PAROCHIAL PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF COSSINGTON.
Area of benefit
COSSINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 MAIN STREET
COSSINGTON
LEICESTER
LE7 4UW
- Phone:
- 07754892842
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window