THE CHESTERFIELD UNITED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 July 1963: Standard registration
- 21 January 2009: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- CHESTERFIELD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
- THE CHESTERFIELD UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM GORDON LAMBERT | Chair | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Thacker | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Yvette Hallam | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAT MASKREY | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mick Brady | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JOHN GROVES | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
FATHER COLEMAN | Trustee | 05 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR FALCONER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.24k | £123.23k | £120.67k | £121.25k | £152.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.30k | £139.47k | £121.50k | £145.48k | £146.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 January 2023 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 January 2023 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE ALMSHOUSE BRANCH ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. (2) THE OBJECT OF THE RELIEF IN NEED BRANCH IS THE RELIEF, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE: (A) IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AND (B) RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT;
Area of benefit
THE AREAS ADMINISTERED BY NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE DISTRICT COUNCIL AND CHESTERFIELD BOROUGH COUNCIL.
Linked charities
- CORNELIUS CLARKE (FOR POOR) AND RICHARD TAYLOR
- EARL OF DEVONSHIRE AND OTHERS
- EARL OF SHREWSBURY
- FRANCIS HEATHCOTE
- FRANCIS MOORE
- GENERAL CHARITY OF THOMAS LARGE
- GEORGE MILWARD
- GEORGE TAYLOR (FOR ALMSHOUSE)
- GEORGE TAYLOR FOR PURPOSES OTHER THAN ALMSHOUSES (ONE-THIRD)
- GEORGE TAYLOR FOR PURPOSES OTHER THAN ALMSHOUSES (TWO THIRDS)
- GODFREY FOLJAMBE (CHESTERFIELD SHARE)
- GODFREY FOLJAMBE (RESIDUE OF CHESTERFIELD SHARE)
- GODFREY HEATHCOTE
- GODFREY WOLSTENHOLME
- JACOB BRAILSFORD
- JAMES MILNES
- JAMES ROBINSON
- JANE FOXLOWE
- JOHN ALLWOOD
- JOHN CHARGE
- LEONARD GILL
- LYDIA BROCKSOPP (TWO THIRDS OF CHESTERFIELD SHARE)
- LYDIA BROCKSOPP(ONE THIRD OF CHESTERFIELD SHARE)
- NICHOLAS YOULE
- RED LION CHARITY OF THOMAS LARGE (SHARE)
- RED LION CHARITY OF THOMAS LARGE (SHARE)
- REVEREND JOHN BOYER
- RICHARD AND GEORGE YOULE
- RICHARD TAYLOR
- SAMUEL SLEIGH
- SARAH ROSE
- SIR GODFREY WEBSTER
- THOMAS LARGE (TOWN COUNCIL CHARITY SHARE FOR ALMSHOUSE)
- 01 July 1963 : Standard registration
- 21 January 2009 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wardens Flat
25 St. Helens Close
Newbold Road
S41 7PQ
- Phone:
- 01246271985
- Email:
- MANAGERALMSHOUSE@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window