ALFRETON WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide one off grants up to -£300 to individuals (not groups or organisations) in need or financial hardship within a specified area of Derbyshire namely Alfreton, Swanwick, Leabrooks, Somercotes and Ironville
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 28 April 1971: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark John Taylor | Chair | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julian Penfold | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN THORNTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33k | £1.89k | £1.94k | £5.07k | £2.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | £0 | £795 | £700 | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 28 APRIL 1971
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVUDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF ALFRETON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF ALFRETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shirland Park Farm
Park Lane
Shirland
Alfreton
DE55 6AX
- Phone:
- 07932564888
- Email:
- jokpenfold@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window