Accounts and annual returns THE HICKMAN PARK SONS OF REST

Charity number: 217134
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 25 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 04 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 03 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 15 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required