Governing document WEST MOORS MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 217171

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1 JUNE 1929 WITH THE CHARITABLE TRUSTS VALIDATION ACT 1954 APPLIED AND TRUST DEED DATED 27 JUNE 1929 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 JANUARY 2022; 7 MARCH 2022; AND 6 NOVEMBER 2023
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF WEST MOORS AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WEST MOORS AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.