Accounts and annual returns TOTTENHAM WAR SERVICES INSTITUTE

Charity number: 217176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 January 2025 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 January 2025 544 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 November 2024 853 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 November 2024 1218 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 March 2021 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required