THE GEORGE MASON CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply the income and such parts of the capital as are considered necessary, from held investments, by way of grant to such charitable institutions and for such charitable purposes as the trustees shall determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 1963: Standard registration
- 20 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.85k | £14.27k | £14.93k | £15.48k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £170 | £810 | £30.83k | £15.86k | £269.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 11 July 2018 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 10 April 2017 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 08 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 MAY 1952 AND 7 AUGUST 1957
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES GENERALLY
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window