Financial history HENRY BURTON ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 217319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £154.34k £336.08k £256.04k £160.31k £270.82k
Total expenditure £169.26k £105.62k £99.51k £162.37k £134.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A