TRUST FUNDS AND PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH BROOKFIELD CHURCH, GORTON

Charity number: 217391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious Organisation

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £14,131
Total expenditure: £14,540

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 1966: Standard registration
  • 17 December 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mr Andrew Threlfall Trustee 07 April 2016
None on record
ADRIAN ATTAWAY Trustee
None on record
JEAN PATRICIA FINDLEY Trustee
None on record
PAUL MARTIN COTTIER ELLIS Trustee
None on record
FRIEDA MARGARET SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £10.82k £12.13k £7.81k £9.90k £14.13k
Total expenditure £12.77k £11.68k £10.81k £9.94k £14.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 12 March 2024 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURE OF SETTLEMENT DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 1707
Charitable objects
TO AUGMENT THE MINISTER STIPEND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 16 March 1966 : Standard registration
  • 17 December 2008 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
41 SOMERFORD ROAD
STOCKPORT
SK5 6QA
Phone:
01613207016
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available