Accounts and annual returns JOSEPH COHEN CHARITY SETTLEMENT NO 2

Charity number: 217430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 07 October 2024 245 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 07 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 10 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required