MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide funding for the needy both individual and in groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 December 1963: Standard registration
- 19 January 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITIES FOR THE POOR (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOAN WHICHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Susan Crosby | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Glenis Rix | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick Knight | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Councillor Marjorie Bayne | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sam Smith | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Mathew Skinner | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
Irene Brown | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN MOORE MBE JP | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DOREEN WESTMORELAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANTHONY CHARLES ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MAX COPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.30k | £428.81k | £36.81k | £39.44k | £31.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.84k | £60.34k | £49.81k | £70.16k | £39.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28 OCT 2000
Charitable objects
A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN ANY ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. B) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF NEWARK, FARNDEN, WINTHORPE, HAWTON, COLLINGHAM, CODDINGTON, LANGFORD AND HOLME
Linked charities
- ALDERMAN JAMES DYSON
- ANTHONY COLLINGWOOD (SHARE)
- BISHOP WHITE
- CHAPMAN
- EMMA WATSON
- FREDERICK DUKE
- GEORGE LAWRENCE
- HENRY HALL
- HERCULES CLAY (SHARE)
- ISABEL MARSHALL
- JOHN JOHNSON
- JOHN MARTIN
- LADY FRANCES LEAKE
- RICHARD LAMB
- THOMAS SUMMERS
- TIMOTHY ELLIS
- WILLIAM BETHELL (SHARE)
- WILLIAM PHILLIPOT (OR PHILLYPOT)
- 09 December 1963 : Standard registration
- 19 January 2022 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Payne & Gammage
48 Lombard Street
Newark
NG24 1XP
- Phone:
- 01636640649
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window