JANE RYLAND CHARITY

Charity Number: 217464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity receives investment income from ownership of Rowington Club Limited, Charifund units and interest and makes grants out of that income in accordance with the objects of the Charity within the Parish of Rowington.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £17,169
Total expenditure: £11,572

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RYLAND FOR ROWINGTON MEN'S CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosalind Gillian Holmes Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Coles Trustee 16 June 2021
LOWSONFORD VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
MARILYN BULL Trustee 28 July 2016
None on record
STEPHEN WILLIAMS Trustee
ROWINGTON ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
BRIAN CHARLES TAYLOR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £19.45k £6.42k £14.49k £16.20k £17.17k
Total expenditure £11.76k £7.93k £11.81k £12.21k £11.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE BUNGALOW
THE AVENUE
ROWINGTON
WARWICK
CV35 7BX
Phone:
01564782961
Website:

No information available