TRUST PROPERTY HELD FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNEXION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No longer in operation (used to relate to dividend income from COIF shares which have now been sold).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 12 November 1963: Standard registration
- WARWARDS LAND TRUST FUND (Working name)
- WARWARDS LANE TRUST FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PARISH CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST STEPHEN AND ST WULSTAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 May 2025 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 26/05/1898 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 09/02/1951
Charitable objects
FOR RELIGIOUS CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNEXION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.STEPHEN, SELLY HILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST STEPHENS PARISH OFFICE
SERPENTINE ROAD
SELLY PARK
BIRMINGHAM
WEST MIDLANDS
B29 7HU
- Phone:
- 01214728253
- Email:
- office@sssw.org.uk
- Website:
-
sssw.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window