TOWN LANDS

Charity number: 217499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of grants or other assistance to the residents of Needham Market & Barking in Suffolk

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,755
Total expenditure: £36,006

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEEDHAM MARKET AND BARKING WELFARE CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jean Rosemary Annis Chair 03 March 1980
NEEDHAM MARKET AND BARKING ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Tracey Louise James Trustee 03 September 2024
NEEDHAM MARKET AND BARKING ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Susan Denise Osborn Trustee 14 November 2022
NEEDHAM MARKET AND BARKING ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Stephen Andrew Phillips Trustee 10 November 2020
NEEDHAM MARKET AND BARKING ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Shaun Gareth Cochrane Trustee 09 October 2014
NEEDHAM MARKET AND BARKING ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THEOBALD'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Clive Martin Walker Trustee 25 October 2011
NEEDHAM MARKET AND BARKING ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
David George Bishop Trustee
NEEDHAM MARKET AND BARKING ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Graham Francis Oxenham Trustee
NEEDHAM MARKET AND BARKING ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.47k £34.20k £32.62k £38.34k £41.76k
Total expenditure £41.51k £26.46k £33.49k £40.62k £36.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Needham Market Town Council Offices
School Street
Needham Market
Ipswich
Suffolk
IP6 8BB
Phone:
01449722494
Website:

nmbwc.onesuffolk.net