Financial history WEDNESBURY SICK POOR FUND

Charity number: 217509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.39k £10.29k £10.37k £11.07k £9.97k
Total expenditure £23.12k £18.81k £23.00k £26.19k £27.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A