Trustees SHREWSBURY MENCAP
Charity number: 217526

Charity reporting is overdue by 1801 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY DURNELL | Chair | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Clare Briscoe | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE KNOWLER | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAREN MANDY NICKLESS | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Stephen Bradley | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET LEASK | Trustee | 11 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE RIVETT | Trustee | 11 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY CHIDLOW | Trustee | 11 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Victor Ellis | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN OSWALD ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
LYNN WORTHINGTON | Trustee | 01 August 2009 |
|
|
||||
Mary Anne Stuart Richey | Trustee | 01 August 2009 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS MULLIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE LILY CHIDLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEFAN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE ANNE CRUMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.