RICHARD'S CASTLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision & maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the parish of Richards Castle with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
Governance
- 15 January 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN ERIC BROOM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sally Margaret Davies | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Patricia Barron | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Edwards | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Ann Bramhall | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katheryn Elizabeth Froggatt | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Elizabeth Moore | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jason Finney | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Womack | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jamison | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ANN THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.61k | £20.20k | £17.24k | £20.29k | £22.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.12k | £12.50k | £12.23k | £19.65k | £25.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.34k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 FEBRUARY 1979
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF RICHARD'S CASTLE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RICHARD'S CASTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burnside
Castle Road
Richards Castle
LUDLOW
SY8 4EW
- Phone:
- 01584831989
- Email:
- tony.womack@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window