EVANS'S HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance and management of 8 modern (1986) almhouses/bungalows occupied by single women over the age of 50, who have lived in Shrewsbury or within 5 miles of it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 07 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH RAVEN | Chair | 06 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Judith Clarkson | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roger White MCIfA | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Margaret Craig | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruth Morgan | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr JEAN BARBARA WATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY COXON HEAVERSEDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.95k | £35.65k | £34.99k | £36.45k | £43.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.22k | £22.75k | £16.66k | £79.00k | £28.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23 OCTOBER 1996 AS VARIED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JUNE 2004 AND SCHEME OF THE COMMISSION DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL FIRST DEFRAY OUT OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY (INCLUDING THE REPAIR AND INSURANCE OF ANY BUILDINGS THEREON) AND ALL OTHER CHARGES AND OUTGOINGS PAYABLE IN RESPECT THEREOF AND ALL THE PROPER COSTS,CHARGES AND EXPENSES OF AND INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHARITY.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE SCHEME OF 23/10/96).
Area of benefit
TOWNS OF SHREWSBURY AND PARISH OF MEOLE BRACE
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Pendle Way
SHREWSBURY
SY3 9QH
- Phone:
- 01743350342
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window