BRIDGNORTH GENERAL MUNICIPAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides affordable housing in Bridgnorth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 21 June 1963: Standard registration
- BRIDGNORTH GENERAL HOUSING CHARITY (Working name)
- BRIDGNORTH HOUSING TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VANESSA VOYSEY | Chair | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Barlow | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jayne Cooper | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
James Gittins | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Oakley | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RAWLINGS | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR TOM BRETTELL | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEREK MOORHOUSE | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID WALKER | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|||||
ROBERT VINCENT DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER SUSAN DURHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £389.03k | £393.43k | £403.43k | £426.81k | £435.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £323.30k | £204.67k | £229.53k | £407.23k | £397.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26/06/1979 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05/01/1988 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02/07/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT AND SUBJECT THERETO, FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED,
Area of benefit
AREA COVERED BY THE BRIDGNORTH DISTRICT COUNCIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bridgnorth Housing Trust
Spinners Court
off St. Stephens Place
Severn Street
BRIDGNORTH
WV15 6AE
- Phone:
- 01746766555
- Email:
- clerk@bgmc.co.uk
- Website:
-
bridgnorthhousingtrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window