THOMAS UNDERWOOD'S CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Other Finance
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 12 February 1986: Standard registration
- 23 May 2007: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 23 May 2007: Funds transferred to 213884 Dickinson Massey Underwood Gill Trust
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.69k | £5.90k | £7.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.82k | £7.06k | £6.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 05 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 14 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 09 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT NOTTINGHAM 15 APRIL 1893 AND SCHEME OF THE 1 MARCH 1963
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF PENSIONS FOR SPINSTERS OR WIDOWS NOT LESS THAN 45 YEARS OF AGE RESIDING IN THE TOWN (NOW CITY) OF NOTTINHAM OR COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAM.
Area of benefit
CITY OR COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window