THE SUTTON CHARITY ICW THE LEICESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE GRANTS OF UP TO £200 TO COVER TRAVEL EXPENSES, PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT/CLOTHING FOR ANYONE WHO IS, OR HAS RECEIVED IN PATIENT TREATMENT WITHIN THE 3 HOSPITALS CONSISTING OF UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS OF LEICESTER I.E. LEICESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY, LEICESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, GLENFIELD HOSPITAL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 21 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayne Elizabeth Grubb | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Reid | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR HERBERT THURSTON | Trustee | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.32k | £4.46k | £4.50k | £4.62k | £4.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.60k | £1.20k | £1.05k | £3.15k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2023 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF FORMER PATIENTS OF THE LEICESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY, THE LEICESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL OR GLENFIELD GENERAL HOSPITAL UNIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O LEICESTER SOCIAL SERVICES DEPT.
LEICESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY
ADULT SOCIAL WORK OFFICE
INFIRMARY SQUARE
LEICESTER
LE1 5WW
- Phone:
- 01162585141
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window