RAVENSTONE HOSPITAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 217605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR POOR WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER BY MEANS OF A COMPLEX OF 25 ALMSHOUSE FLATS WITH A RESIDENT WARDEN. THE AREA OF BENEFIT FROM WHICH RESIDENTS MAY BE APPOINTED IS THE ANCIENT PARISHES OF RAVENSTONE AND SWANNINGTON AND THE ANCIENT TOWNSHIP OF SWANNINGTON, LEICESTERSHIRE. APPOINTMENTS MAY BE MADE FROM OUTSIDE THIS AREA IN THE ABSENCE OF ANY APPLICATION WITHIN THE AREA.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £109,741
Total expenditure: £93,622

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RAVENSTONE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gareth Michael Braithwaite Chair 17 November 2021
None on record
Lucy Elizabeth Cure Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
DAVID BATES Trustee 22 November 2023
None on record
ELLIOTT GERRALD CHARLES ALLMAN Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
NICHOLAS EASTWOOD Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record
REBECCA RILEY Trustee 20 November 2019
HOSPICE HOPE
Received: On time
ARTHUR JOHN PAINE Trustee 15 November 2017
None on record
PETER NICHOLAS TUDOR-JONES Trustee 16 November 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £83.85k £97.33k £98.96k £104.38k £109.74k
Total expenditure £116.85k £89.96k £108.58k £104.83k £93.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 25 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 25 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 22 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT NOTTINGHAM ON 5TH JUNE 1967
Charitable objects
DISTRIBUTION AT OR ABOUT CHRISTMAS EVERY YEAR AMONGST THE LADIES OF RAVENSTONE HOSPITAL OR ITS INMATES AS THE GOVERNORS THEREOF FOR THE TIME BEING IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RAVESTONE, COLEORTON AND TOWNSHIP OF SWANNINGTON
Registration history
  • 08 March 1968 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
1A Ravenstone Court
Hospital Lane
Ravenstone
COALVILLE
Leicestershire
LE67 2BX
Phone:
07443228133