THE RIGHT HONOURABLE SARAH, BARONESS BRAYE'S CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Money given to widows in need of support in the parishes of Swinford and Stanford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 21 November 1963: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- BARONESS BRAYE'S CHARITY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2007 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 04 March 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME 7/8/1863
Charitable objects
CLOTHING OR FUEL TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONGST EIGHT POOR WOMEN, BEING WIDOWS OF ANY AGE OR SPINSTERS OVER THE AGE OF 60, FOUR OF WHOM SHALL BE RESIDETN IN SWINFORD AND FOUR IN STANFORD-ON-AVON. (THE BENEFITS MAY BE DISTRIBUTED AMONGST DESERVING POOR MARRIED WOMEN IF NO POOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS EXIST AT THE TIME OF DISTRIBUTION.)
Area of benefit
SWINFORD AND STANFORD-ON-AVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window