MELIORA ADLERCRON'S RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial help to those who are sick or infirm in Oasby, Aisby, Heydour, Culverthorpe, Kelby and Welby.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 June 1963: Standard registration
- MELIORA'S COTTAGE NURSING HOME AT AISBY (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mark Hill | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jack sparkes | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
hannah san jose whittaker | Trustee | 05 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE ELIZABETH KING | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GROUP CAPTAIN MICHAEL JOHN PRIESTLEY | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev GEORGINA MACHELL | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNN LESLEY ANN RODGERS | Trustee | 20 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.23k | £3.31k | £3.23k | £3.21k | £3.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.63k | £2.20k | £2.50k | £4.32k | £3.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26 NOVEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE PARISHES OF HEYDOUR, CULVERTHORPE WITH KELBY, AND WELBY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 22(2)-(4) OF SCHEME OF 26 NOVERMBER 1980)
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF HEYDOUR, CULVERTHORPE WITH KELBY AND WELBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mossop & Bowser
10 Spalding Road
Holbeach
SPALDING
Lincolnshire
PE12 7LP
- Phone:
- 07811372576
- Email:
- RMHILL@MOSSOPS.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window