Financial history JOHN EDEN'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 217654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £22.47k £19.50k £23.63k £24.20k £23.37k
Total expenditure £26.74k £18.25k £20.48k £17.02k £38.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A