DORSET MASONIC CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COLLECTION OF DONATIONS AND DISBURSEMENTS TO THOSE IN NEED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 29 October 1963: Standard registration
- D M C (Working name)
- DORSET MASONIC CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATT DEVEREUX | Chair | 28 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Francis Richards | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Hughes | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Owen Barrett | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEWART McKELL | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADAM MATTHEW PERKINS | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter Lofthouse | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Coxall | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.69k | £6.78k | £4.98k | £6.96k | £13.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.35k | £49.74k | £45.84k | £44.80k | £38.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BYE LAWS DATED 07 MAR 1944 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2003 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2004 AS AMENDED ON 13 FEB 2007 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED ON 19 OCT 2017 as amended on 28 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
2.1 THE SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND RELIEF OF DESERVING: 2.1.1 DORSET FREEMASONS. 2.1.2 DEPENDANTS OF DORSET FREEMASONS. 2.1.3 DEPENDANTS NOW LIVING IN DORSET OF NON-DORSET FREEMASONS. 2.2 TO PROMOTE THE CAUSE OF MASONIC CHARITY WITHIN THE MASONIC PROVINCE OF DORSET AND THE MASONIC CRAFT OR ROYAL ARCH AT LARGE. 2.3 SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND RELIEF TO AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER DESERVING CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND INDIVIDUALS IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTION AS THE TRUSTEES AND GENERAL COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 South Street
Bridport
Dorset
DT6 3NJ
- Phone:
- 01308 422224
- Email:
- sdw@mwburrough.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window