CORRIS INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of the Corris Institute (a Village Hall) and its facilities, for the use and benefit of the wider Community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
- Powys
Governance
- 05 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL JOHN CUTRESS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jemma Francesca Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine owen | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eirlys Wyn Jones | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Donald Ward | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUTH SELMAN | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE CLARE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAT WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TOM EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAYNE TYSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.92k | £13.57k | £7.21k | £13.50k | £11.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.17k | £6.52k | £9.19k | £11.60k | £10.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AMENDED BY SCHEME 1 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF TALYLLYN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF TALYLLYN
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORRIS
INSTITUTE
CORRIS
MACHYNLLETH
SY20 9SH
- Phone:
- 01654761346
- Email:
- institutecorris@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.