RICHARD WILLIAMS IMPROVEMENT FUND

Charity number: 217705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We give grants to organisations that will help improve the village of Aberdyfi.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £1,000
Total expenditure: £770

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Bradbury Trustee 11 October 2021
THE RICHARD ROBERTS FUND
Received: On time
Dr Sara Bradbury-Willis Trustee 26 January 2021
THE RICHARD ROBERTS FUND
Received: On time
Catherine Lloyd Trustee 24 October 2017
None on record
DEWI OWEN Trustee 29 November 2011
THE RICHARD ROBERTS FUND
Received: On time
NEUADD DYFI
Received: On time
DAVE WILLIAMS Trustee
THE RICHARD ROBERTS FUND
Received: On time
THE ABERDOVEY LITERARY INSTITUTE
Received: On time
MEGAN REYNOLDS Trustee
THE RICHARD ROBERTS FUND
Received: On time
NEUADD DYFI
Received: On time
LEWIS LLOYD'S (ABERGROES) CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £2.64k £88 £88 £0 £1.00k
Total expenditure £364 £0 £945 £355 £770
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 11 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 11 November 2024 284 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 10 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
25 Maes Newydd
Aberdovey
LL35 0PD
Phone:
01654768289
Website:

No information available