Accounts and annual returns LLANFAIR CAEREINION PUBLIC HALL

Charity Number: 217716
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 19 August 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 02 August 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 03 August 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 August 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 March 2021 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required