Accounts and annual returns SUSAN JONES CHARITY

Charity number: 217739
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 31 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 11 November 2014 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required