HUMPHRY SALWEY BENEFACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of financial hardship among people living or working in Shropshire and in particular those in the district of Ludlow, Herefordshire, Worcestershire and Powys by providing such persons with goods/services which they could not otherwise afford through lack of means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugo Salwey | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|||||
GRAEME PERKS | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
HUMPHREY SALWEY CBE JP TD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/12/2019 | 02/12/2020 | 02/12/2021 | 02/12/2022 | 02/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £515 | £530 | £697 | £989 | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £550 | £0 | £1.02k | £600 | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT PPR ON THE 5 MARCH 1918 AND SCHEME OF THE 4 NOVEMBER 1921 AND 7 DECEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN SHROPSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE IN THE DISTRICT OF LUDLOW, HEREFORDSHIRE, WORCESTERSHIRE AND POWYS BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. THE RECIPIENTS SHALL BE SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, AND THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO REVOKE THE GRANT OF ANY ANNUITY AT ANY TIME WITHOUT BEING REQUIRED TO ASSIGN ANY REASON
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR TO THOSE FROM THE DISTRICT OF LUDLOW, HEREFORDSHIRE, WORCESTERSHIRE AND POWYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LODGE
OVERTON
LUDLOW
SY8 4DU
- Phone:
- 07766545515
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window